Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Florida Mulch, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Greensource Landscape & Sports Turf, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Florida Mulch, Inc., a Florida corporation, against GreenSource Landscape & Sports Turf, Inc., also a Florida corporation. The complaint alleges a breach of contract for goods sold and delivered. Florida Mulch claims that i...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MEANS OF FINAL DISPOSITION | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | TD BANK NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE ON GREENSOURCE LANDSCAPE AND SPORTS TURF INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.