Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elr Restoration Inc A A O Quy Luong, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against American Integrity Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by ELR Restoration Inc on behalf of Quy Luong against American Integrity Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $8,000 but less than $30,000. The defendant, American Integrity Insurance Company, is accus...
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: March 26, 2021PROPOSED AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2071 | Docket Event | ||
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.