Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Yave Yire Enterprises Inc. Formerly D B A Roof Depot, Inc. A A O Dhanpaul Ramnarine, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Fednat Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Yave Yire Enterprises Inc. formerly d/b/a Roof Depot, Inc., a/a/o Dhanpaul Ramnarine, against Fednat Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract and demands a jury trial. The plaintiff seeks damages exceedin...
COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.