Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Davis, Mikalla, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Paradise Palms Homeowners Association, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUCTION
Date: March 26, 20214/5/2021
Date: January 03, 20243/26/2021
Date: January 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE: | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021029103 | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.