Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Velez Ferrer, Saul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Cintron, Pedro Elias, United Services Automobile Association, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK) | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.