Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Luis Mayedo, Karel, Pena Camejo, Daymarelys, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Karel Luis Mayedo and Daymarelys Pena Camejo against Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had a homeowners insurance policy with the defendant, and their property located at 3319 Kal...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2069 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.