Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Quesada, Rafael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Federal Express Company, Vasquez, Edgar, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Rafael Quesada against Edgar Vasquez and Federal Express Corporation. The complaint alleges that on October 9, 2019, while Rafael Quesada was driving on Interstate 4 in Osceola County, Florida, Edgar Vasque...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2021DEFENDANTS' DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: May 11, 20215/11/2021
Date: January 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 1.720 MEDIATION DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.