Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chacon Centeno, Pablo Jose, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint was filed by Pablo Jose Chacon Centeno against American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges damages exceeding $30,000, exclusive of...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFEDNANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNAITON OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.