Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alva, Junia, Alva, Olivia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed by Junia Alva and Olivia Alva against State Farm Florida Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract by the defendant. The amount i...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL-LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 12/20/2022 AT 3:00 PM IN VR BEFORE JUDGE: SCHREIBER, MARGARET H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.