Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Plaza On Main Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Castner, Ryan, Fast Tax Service Center Llc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2039 | Docket Event | ||
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.