Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dalton, Simonea, Meritage Homes Of Florida Inc, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case against Meritage Homes Of Florida, A Florida Corporation, Sevan Plastering Inc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeConstruction |
This complaint is filed by Simonea Dalton against Meritage Homes of Florida, Inc. in the Circuit Court for the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The complaint alleges that Meritage Homes of Florida, Inc., a Florida corporation, viola...
MERITAGE HOMES OF FLORIDA INC'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 20216/14/2021
Date: January 30, 2024COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL-LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 03/17/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN 6A BEFORE JUDGE: ALVARO, CHAD | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING MERITAGE HOMES OF FLORIDA, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL-LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 03/17/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN VR BEFORE JUDGE: SCHREIBER, MARGARET H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.