Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with BROWN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWN, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategorySummary Admistration > $1,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3545.1580. / 3453553) | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD REAL ESTATE | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINDER WAIVER AND CONSENT (CINDY A JACKSON) | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3534.4729. / 3441111) | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.