Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Legg, Robert P., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jacobs, Arthur Ivan, against Hernandez, Leslie D., John, David L., John, Diana, Miller, Bonita, Miller, Robert H., (total of 7) See All represented by Flanagan, James W, Oates, Thomas Daniel, Rathburn, Patricia A, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: RECEIPT OF TRANSFER | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK: BROWARD COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK: 071917 JACOB SCHLOZ & ASSOCIATES | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | EMAIL: 061417 PATRICIA RATHBURN | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | CLS ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | FILED IN EVIDENCE: JOHNS COMPOSIT EXH 1 | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | EMAIL: 060917 TARAN OGRADY | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: 060517 ARTHUR JACOBS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.