Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Picard, Lawrence Gilford J, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Robbins, David M, against Department Of Highway Safety A, represented by Helfant, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | CLOSING ORDER: AND OPINION | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: ORAL ARGUMENT | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: ORAL ARGUMENT | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 071817 10AM | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: 060117 SUSAN COHEN | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE: LAWRENCE PICARD JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.