Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schwend, Brenda, Schwend, Paul, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Shutters, Peter Glenn, against Adrick Partners, Llc, represented by Kissane, Joseph Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence Environmental Toxic |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EMAIL: APRIL N JARVIS | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: 01/24/2019 130PM | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE: EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 01/24/19 130PM | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.