Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brown, Walter O, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Scott, Mary Scheps, against Andrea F. Lennon, P.A., Katras, George, Lennon, Andrea F, Prestia, Donna, represented by Dollinger, Jeffrey Ross, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NON CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL JOINT STIPULATION | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: GEORGE KATRAS 060616 | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANDREA LENNON 060316 | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: RETURNS OF SERVICE | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DONNA PRESTIA 060616 | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:GEORGE KATRAS | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:ANDREA LENNON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.