Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bryan Kipling Webb filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Probate Plantation Key with Luis Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLuis Garcia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseProbate Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time Comments: to close estate (JV) | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition * Comments: to extend time to close estate (E) | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time Comments: to Close the Estate (jv) | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition * Comments: TO EXTEND TO TO CLOSE ESTATE (E) | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Memo From Clerk To Judge | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof Of Service * Comments: Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Notice to Creditors on Northstar Location Services, LLC | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction & Release Of Claim | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory Comments: (E) | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of No Florida Estate Tax Due Comments: (E) | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Return Mail Comments: SETH MARMOR, ESQ. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.