Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citizens Bank Na, filed a(n) case represented by Jeffrey Lee Kahn, against Taylor M Deemer, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed by Citizens Bank, N.A. against Taylor M Deemer in the Circuit Court of Manatee County, Florida. The complaint alleges three counts: breach of contract, money lent, and quantum meruit. The damages claimed in this action exceed...
COMPLAINT
Date: April 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED / TAYLOR M DEEMER | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 908385 | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 4/5/2021 | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - LOAN APPLICATION / ACCOUNT SUMMARY | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 412021CA001356CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 4/5/2021 | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11675899 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.