Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
David Raskin, filed a(n) case represented by Paris Richard Webb, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Paul S Vicary, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by David Raskin against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 12th Judicial Circuit in Manatee County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $30,000, excluding court costs, attorney's ...
COMPLAINT
Date: April 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - PATRICK NEVILLE APRIL 19 2022 2PM / JEAN NEVILLE APRIL 19 2022 2PM | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM DAVID RASKIN WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 11, 2021 10:00 A.M. | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.