Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jessica Lee, filed a(n) case represented by Gary Lee Printy, against Dillon Otoole, Pamela Otoole, represented by Scott E Zimmer, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DILLON O'TOOLE AND PAMELA O'TOOLE, | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR'S REPORT | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES WITH ATTACHED SUBPOENA | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AS TO DATE AND TIME - JESSICA LEE 10/26/2021 1PM EST / 1OAM PST VIA ZOOM | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AS TO DATE AND MEDIATOR / DECEMBER 9 2021 1PM VIA ZOOM | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OFFPRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE COPIES | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.