Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Granada Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Pedro Hernandez, against Eich Properties Of Lehigh Acres Llc, El Shaddai Auto Llc, represented by Jack Morgan, Michael Cheffer, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith R Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCa Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Granada Insurance Company against El Shaddai Auto, LLC, Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. AMR6034801 as subrogee of EICH Properties of Lehigh Acres, LLC, and EICH ...
Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 22, 2022Order Denying Motion
Date: April 14, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Deposition | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.