Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
In Chung, Mal Chung, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith R Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCa Contracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 17, 2021Order of Reassignment
Date: April 26, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: April 20, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 20, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: April 20, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 20, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: April 13, 2021Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Production
Date: April 12, 2021Complaint
Date: April 12, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Reassignment | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | UCR Primary Judicial Officer Change | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Stay | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Standing Order in Civil Cases |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.