Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Everett Sobania, Rita Sobania, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Michael Hagen, against Heinz Wittich, Ivy Eschert, Unknown Occupant, represented by Michael Hagen, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Alane C Laboda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlane C Laboda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCa Homestead Residential Foreclosure 2: $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Return of Service on Summons Unserved
Date: April 20, 2021Value of Claim Calculation Sheet
Date: April 12, 2021Wittich, Heinz - Summons (20 day) Issued
Date: April 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Eschert, Ivy - Summons (20 day) Issued | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Unserved | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Wittich, Heinz - Summons (20 day) Issued | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Eschert, Ivy - Summons (20 day) Issued | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Served | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Unknown Occupant - Summons (20 day) Issued | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.