Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
White, Michael A, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mattox, Marie A, against Hotel Equities Dba Fairfield I, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with MILLER, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMILLER, MICHAEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: February 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: MILLER , MICHAEL D Assigned | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2016002516 | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , WILLIAM L Assigned | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Case 322016CA000251CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/28/2016 | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.