Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Godwin, Paula Ann, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac, against Shady Grove Pentecostal Holine, represented by Maus, Kathy J, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
NOTICE OF FILING
Date: August 01, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2017AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: June 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT, SHADY GROVE PENTECOSTAL HOLINESS CHURCH'S, MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT, SHADY GROVE PENTECOSTAL HOLINESS CHURCH'S, MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 10, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - SHADY GROVE PENTECOSTAL HOLINESS CHURCH | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ATTEND THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 7, 2017 VIA TELEPHONE | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 3/23/2018 0900 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 10/10/2017 | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 4/30/2018 0900 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 10/10/2017 | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.