Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Maynard, Dennis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Printy, Gary Lee, against Sheriff Tommy Ford Of Bay Coun, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , WILLIAM L Assigned | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2016002087 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $410.00 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 10/3/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.