Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Yadley, Girard, filed a(n) Other case against Julie Jones, Secretary Florida, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK MINUTE SHEET | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR FILE | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF VENUE LETTER | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO PROPER VENUE | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO PROPER VENUE | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | SENT TO LAW CLERK FOR REVIEW | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO RESPOND AND MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE PROPER VENUE | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TO RESPOND | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | SENT TO LAW CLERK FOR REVIEW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.