Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Patel, Pratik R, against Unknown Tenant In Possession O, Campbellton Farm Service, Morales, Herlinda, Barnes, Steve A, represented by Spires, Winter Emil, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2016 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Nonhomestead Resid $50,001-249,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING : NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEFAULT ENTERED 9/30/16 | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS STEVE A. BARNES A/K/A STEVE ALLEN BARNES MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S, HERLINDA MORALES A/K/A LINDA MORALES, MOTIN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Winter Spires Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: NKA JERRY MCCLELLAN 7/28/16 | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RONALD BARBER AS OWNER 7/26/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.