Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deloney, Randy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Talmadge, Joseph Daniel, against Sapps Land And Excavating Inc, Jerry Sapp Timber Co, Driggers, Timothy H, represented by Green, Herbert Guy, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with William L. Wright presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam L. Wright Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE AND MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | RENEWED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR BIFURCATION | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 3/7/17 10:45 AM | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 3/7/2017 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge MICHAEL MILLER presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.