Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Holland, Dwight F, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mattox, Marie A, against Community Housing Partners Cor, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2016 |
CategoryOther-Discrimination Employment/Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | RECORDED PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT - ALL ISSUES WERE RESOLVED | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 3/22/2018 0900 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 3/20/2018 | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF: CLEOPATIRA MUNCY APRIL 4, 2018 AT 10:00 A.M.; MARY JO HESTER APRIL 4, 2018 AT 10:30 A.M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.