Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dalton, Robin, Baker, Estate Of Evelyn, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Lp Marianna Llc D B A Signatur, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence- Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 03/05/18 | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | RECORDED STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 3/5/2018 1030 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 1/4/2018 | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 3/5/2018 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/5/18 AT 10:30AM | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 10/3/2017 0230 PM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 10/3/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.