Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Franklin, Courseicon Dewayne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Normandeau, Thomas Steven, against Lee, Richard Benjamin, Tallahassee Scrap Metals Incor, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MEDIATION APPEARANCE | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MGMT CONFERENCE on 8/22/2018 0940 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 5/18/2018 | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Event CASE MGMT CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/20/2018 at 0940 AM, MX - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED* NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Event CASE MGMT CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/22/2018 at 0940 AM, MX - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 8/22/18 AT 9:40AM | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE SCHEDULING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Event CASE MGMT CONFERENCE scheduled on 5/8/2018 at 0155 PM, MX - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.