Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Ross, Shamira Janay, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADKMRZE | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADKMRZE | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $181.00 RECEIPT #2021016870 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | REINSTATED DL | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 03/26/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $98.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ADKMRZE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.