Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Haywood, Douglas W, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A3HH78P | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A3HH78P | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $98.00 RECEIPT #2021005669 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 03/13/2021 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION A3HH78P FILED, OFFENSE DATE 02/11/2021 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (320.07(3 A)) OPER.VEH./USING MOB.HOME W/EXPIRED REGISTRATION-6MO OR LESS | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 001612 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.