Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Roberts, Todderick Dejuan, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACV2UPE | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACV2UPE | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $136.00 RECEIPT #2021011494 | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 03/26/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $113.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ACV2UPE | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 03/16/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.