Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Novotny, Erik Len, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryNon Criminal Infractions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $93.00 RECEIPT #2021007444 | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SENT LETTER ADVISING CORRECT AMOUNT DUE OF $93 BY 03/12/21. RETURNED CHECK. | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED CHECK | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 IN 000196 A | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO COMPLY WITH BOATING CITATION REQUIRED BY: 03/12/2021 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (327.50(1)) IMPROPER INSUFF SAFETY EQUIP | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.