Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Coney, Dandre Marquis, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI - Recorded (OR.3390.1765. / 3120210012255) | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACV2TME | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CT 001618 A | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ACV2TME FILED, OFFENSE DATE 01/28/2021 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (322.03(1)) DRIVING WITHOUT VALID LICENSE | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ACV2TME | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.