Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Perez Moreno, Pascual, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with VAUGHN, DAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVAUGHN, DAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES, COSTS, AND ADDITIONAL CHARGES ($ 1,546.50)
Date: December 08, 2021ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 15, 2021INFORMATION FILED
Date: March 24, 2021CREDIT TIME SERVED
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 05/26/2022 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $1571.50 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 10 DAY NOTICE REQUIRED BY: 04/11/2022 | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 12/05/2021 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO STATE OF FLORIDA RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CF000193AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: FJFCC-12/8/2021 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES, COSTS, AND ADDITIONAL CHARGES ($ 1,546.50) | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED ORDER ON CHARGES/COSTS/FEES - Recorded (OR.3493.1857. / 3120210086320) | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT & SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.3493.1844. / 3120210086316) | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES, COSTS, AND ADDITIONAL CHARGES ($ 1,546.50) - Recorded (OR.3493.1858. / 3120210086321) | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 2 SENTENCING NOTES: ADJ. G. -(F). 8 MONTHS IRCJ, 264 DAYS CTS, $50 COI TO IRCSO, ALL FEES/COSTS REDUCED TO A CIVIL LIEN, DNA SWAB REQUIRED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.