Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramirez, Kristine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez, George E, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with PEGG, ROBERT L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePEGG, ROBERT L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY WORK SENT TO DOR | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY WORK SENT TO DOR | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | COPY WORK SENT TO DOR | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | CSE PAYMENT HISTORY | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT/EVIDENCE LIST - CSE PAYMENT HISTORY | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING RECOMMENDED ORDER - Recorded (OR.3144.2123. / 3120180053360) | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.