Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lightle, Dawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lightle, Roger, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with KANAREK, PAUL B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKANAREK, PAUL B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE /S/ JPBK | |
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORBK:2199 PGS: 2272 15 PAGES | |
August 21, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING (FINAL HEARING) | |
August 21, 2007 | Docket Event | ||
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM TO MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (MARITAL SETTLEMENT & ADDENDUM) | |
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION (FIRE CHIEF JOHN KING) | |
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | (+)7/31/07 @10:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.