Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Trudy M, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Young, Michael A, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with KANAREK, PAUL B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKANAREK, PAUL B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryDor Uifsa (Non-Iv-D) Rspt Out State |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DATED 9/4/13 | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | COPY OF ORDER DATED 11/15/12 | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | COPY OF PA ORDER | |
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORBK:2198 PGS:1910 4 PAGES | |
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OF COURT | |
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | COPY OF CERTIFICATION OF ARREARAGE | |
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event | COPY OF ORDER OF COURT | |
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT TO DISBURSE COLLECTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.