Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baker, Josh B, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Horner, Tara, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with KANAREK, PAUL B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKANAREK, PAUL B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryPrivate Paternity/Disestablishment Of Paternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | (+)11AM, OFFICE OF ATLANTIC COURT REPORTERS | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION-TARA HORNER,12/18/07 | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 12/18/08 AT THE OFFICES | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | (+) OF ATLANTIC COURT REPORTING @ 11:00 | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | (+)20 DAYS /S/J PBK (11/05/2007) | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MGT CONF - (IF RESPONDENT WISHES TO | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | (+)DISPUTE PATERNITY,SHE SHALL FILE ANSWER WITHIN | |
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.