Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Candanosa, Elizabeth Anne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Candanosa, Sergio Y, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO CANDANOSA, ELIZABETH ANNE RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312006DR051321XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: FJ-7/9/2020 | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312006DR051321XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: FJ-7/9/2020 | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312006DR051321XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: FJ-7/9/2020 | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CSE PAYMENT HISTORY | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MODIFICATION | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CSE PAYMENT HISTORY | |
July 03, 2020 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (ELIZABEHT) | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 07/08/2020 AT 2:15 PM IN 5/ , JDG: COX, CYNTHIA L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.