Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hughes, James filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryEstate - Summary/Formal |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE /S/RLP ON 4/19/2010 | |
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | PAMELIA L.HUGHES- | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ***FILE TO "J"RLP W/ORDER ON 4/16/10**R:4/19/2010 | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY AND AMENDED INVENTORY ON THE | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PETITION TO TRANSFER REAL PROPERTY/S/J RLP ON 3/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.