Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rheel As Personal Representative Of The, Vera, Rheel, Vera, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rawnsley, Douglas G, Rawnsley, Marla J, against Indian River Memorial Hospital Inc, represented by Bunn, Marsha, Adams, Janet W, Wright, Cara H, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with KANAREK, PAUL B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKANAREK, PAUL B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryMalpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - Recorded (OR.3115.738. / 3120180028554) | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DISPOSAL | |
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER TO ATTY RAWNSLEY RE:DISPOSING EXHIBITS | |
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER TO ATTY ADAMS RE:DISPOSING EXHIBITS | |
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR CAMO | |
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT INDIAN RIVER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' LEGAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL /S/CLC 8/8/11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.