Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lm Education Credit Finance Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Battaglino, Richard, against Nagy, Attila, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with HAWLEY, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAWLEY, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ORBK: 2236 PG: 669 | |
June 19, 2007 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMS-ATTILA NAGY-PS (FRANK/BOX 14) | |
June 19, 2007 | Docket Event | RTD:7/10/07 SVD:NOT FOUND | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200612290020004, PAYMENT $256.00 | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | CC: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | CC: DOCKET SHEET | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | PLEADINGS | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRANSFER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.