Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Singer , Shayna L., against Chaverra, Miriam D, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Hooi, Michael. J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHooi, Michael. J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1815;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/Dd5C448B-93F0-41F2-B2E9-E8Af87Ea3063/Results/F75C6E34-E906-4E25-9Bad-Bf90F2D6Dab5/Lines/3E845375-A405-4296-802E-0Ae385583363/Disposition_Html |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: April 27, 2021E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET
Date: April 15, 2021REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | REMOVAL FROM DISMISSAL DOCKET DENIED | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SMALL CLAIMS DISMISSAL NOTICE |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION N PER AO S-2021-057 | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
COURT TICKET AT PRETRIAL |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 04/26/2021 DEFT. MIRIAM D. CHAVERRA |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.