Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gryglewicz, Nathan Paul, against Goodman, Brittney, Price, Robert Wade, Price, Tiffany, United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with COWDEN, ANGELA JANE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOWDEN, ANGELA JANE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: December 31, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | **CLERK RELEASED ORIGINAL DOCUMENT PER JUDGE'S OERDER IN PREPAID FEDEX STANDARD OVERNIGHT EVELOPE PROVIDED BY PLTF'S ATTY** | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION AND RETURN ORIGIANL NOTE AND MORTGAGE **CLERK TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS UPON RECEIPT OF A SECURED SELF ADDRESSED FEDEX ENVELOPE** | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN CLOSED | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for REOPEN CASE/CIVIL OTHER on 5/20/2022 | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN CASE | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE - 5/05/2022 @ 11:00 AM) - HARD COPY | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING MAY 5, 2022 FORECLOSURE SALE | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.