Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Church, Kelley Louise, against Cheryl Ann Velasquez, Unknown, In Possession 1, Unknown Tenan, In Possession 2, Unknown Tenan, Jose Antonio Velasquez, Unknow, Morsenit, Philletta, (total of 7) See All represented by Hernandez, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with ESTRADA, PETER FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeESTRADA, PETER FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK TENANT 2)
Date: December 17, 2019ANSWER (CHERYL)
Date: December 18, 2019SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY **COPY TO JUDGE'S BASKET BY CKW***
Date: December 30, 2019ORDER PLACING CASE ON INACTIVE STATUS
Date: January 07, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
Date: November 25, 2019PLTF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STATUS TO ACTIVE
Date: November 18, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (CHERYL)
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK SPOUSE OF CHERYL)
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK SPOUSE OF JOSE)
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JOSE)
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #1)
Date: November 25, 2019ORDER PLACING CASE ON ACTIVE STATUS
Date: December 08, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK TENANT #2)
Date: November 25, 2019EPORTAL RECEIPT
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/6/2019 (CHERYLANN) SUB
Date: December 17, 2019DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ENTRY OF CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: December 17, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK SPOUSE OF CHERYLANN)
Date: December 17, 2019SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/16/2019 (JOSE) IND
Date: December 17, 2019PLTF'S AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2020PLTF'S AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY TO DETERMINE MILITARY STATUS
Date: December 17, 2020RETURNED MAIL (CHERYL ANN LELASQUEZ) **UNABLE TO FORWARD**
Date: December 18, 2020RETURNED MAIL (UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION #1) **UNABLE TO FORWARD**
Date: December 18, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CKW (JOSE VELASQUEZ; PHILETTA MORSENIT)
Date: January 06, 2021ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS SECURE IN CIVIL DIVISION
Date: February 11, 2021NOTICE OF FILING (ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE) - HARD COPY
Date: February 11, 2021PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (4/29/21 @ 3:45pm) PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMIN. ORDER 3-29.2
Date: April 27, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: April 29, 2021ADDING MACHINE TAPE
Date: April 29, 2021PROPOSED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SALE **PROPOSED**
Date: April 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF TITLE **PROPOSED**
Date: April 29, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: April 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT **PROPOSED**
Date: April 29, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED ELECTRONICALLY TO THE NEWS-SUN BY CSD
Date: April 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON ALL PARITES OF CLERK'S NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 02, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE 4/29/2021 @ 11:00AM) - ORIGINAL
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: June 29, 2021INTENT TO BID FORM (4 ACE HOLDINGS, LLC)
Date: June 30, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF SALE - 6/30/21 @ 11:00AM) EMAIL
Date: June 29, 2021INTENT TO BID FORM (KUNAL HARPALANI)
Date: June 30, 2021INTENT TO BID FORM (INVESTMENT REAL ESTATE LS LLC)
Date: June 30, 2021INTENT TO BID FORM (DANCING HOMES LLC)
Date: June 30, 2021INTENT TO BID FORM (MAHARG ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC)
Date: June 30, 2021INTENT TO BID FORM (JUAN DE JESUS)
Date: June 30, 2021INTENT TO BID FORM ***SUCCESSFUL THIRD PARTY BIDDER***
Date: June 30, 2021BID SHEET ($165,000/F.L. DEED, LLC)
Date: June 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SALE (COPY TO PARTIES BY CKW)
Date: June 30, 2021$70 -SALE FEE
Date: June 30, 2021FUNDS DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY OF COURT $165,000.00
Date: June 30, 2021DEFT CHERYL VELASQUEZ'S ASSIGNEE'S MOTION TO DISBURSE SURPLUS FUNDS
Date: July 06, 2021CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (COPY TO PARTIES WITH ENVS PROVIDED BY CKW)
Date: July 13, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS (4/28/23 @ 2:25PM)
Date: March 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT TO RAPID SURPLUS REFUND, LLC (FORWARDED TO FINANCE BY CKW)
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF FILING (FLORIDA QUIT CLAIM DEED)
Date: October 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT TO CHERYL ANN VELASQUEZ (FORWARDED TO FINANCE BY CKW)
Date: October 12, 2023CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO FINANCE BY CSD)
Date: October 18, 2023RETURNED MAIL TO CHERYL ANN VELASQUEZ RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD
Date: November 07, 2023RETURNED MAIL TO JOSE VELASQUEZ RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD
Date: November 07, 2023RETURNED MAIL TO PHILLETTA MORSENIT RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD
Date: November 07, 2023RETURNED MAIL TO UNK TENANT #2 RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD
Date: November 07, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 25, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($117,496.29)
Date: November 25, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (UNK SPOUSE OF JOSE)
Date: December 17, 2019SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/9/2019 (UNK TENANT 1 NKA PHILLETTA MORSENIT) IND
Date: December 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL TO CHERYL ANN VELASQUEZ RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL TO JOSE VELASQUEZ RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL TO PHILLETTA MORSENIT RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL TO UNK TENANT #2 RECEIVED 11/7/23 - UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT (COPY TO FINANCE BY CSD) | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT TO RAPID SURPLUS REFUND, LLC (FORWARDED TO FINANCE BY CKW) | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT TO CHERYL ANN VELASQUEZ (FORWARDED TO FINANCE BY CKW) | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN CLOSED | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFS' EXCLUSIVE ASSIGNEE'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS AND DENYING F.L. DEED, LLC'S MOTION TO DISBURSE SURPLUS FUNDS | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (FLORIDA QUIT CLAIM DEED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.