Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woods, Kevin, Woods, Robert, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Thompson, Steven Fletcher, against Doe, Jane, Doe, John, John And Son Land Development, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL ON JANE DOE | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL ON JOHN DOE | |
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCDE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTION SET FOR 12/13/16 @ 9:30 | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOHN DOE (SPOUSE OF MAC JOHNSON , DANA JOHNSON ) ON 9/9/16 | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JANE DOE ( DANA JOHNSON0 ON 9/9/16 | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $30.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.